This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:21:54 (UTC).

Mossiat v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Mossiat filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12459

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Mossiat

Defendant

Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P. Kambouris

Attorney at Dane Shulman Associates, LLC

1629 Blue Hill Avenue

Boston, MA 02126

Defendant Attorneys

Mario D. Nimock

Attorney at Coughlin Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Christopher G. Betke

Attorney at Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. summons served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019.. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mario D. Nimock on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover Sheet

1 #4

Category Form

1 #3

Exhibit Settlement Demand

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7998998 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Settlement Demand, #4 Category Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover Sheet)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. summons served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019.. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mario D. Nimock on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7998998 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Settlement Demand, #4 Category Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CA Cover Sheet)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less