This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2020 at 10:40:09 (UTC).

Moss v. Sperry Drilling Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Moss filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Sperry Drilling Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02034

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clinton Moss

Defendants

Sperry Drilling Services, LLC

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance Richard Bremer

Attorney at Alvarez Stauffer Bremer PLLC

815 Walker Street, Suite 1450

Houston, TX 77002

Graig J Alvarez

Attorney at Alvarez Stauffer Bremer PLLC

815 Walker St., Suite 1450

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Sperry Drilling Services, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Bremer, Lance) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sperry Drilling Services, LLC, filed.(Bremer, Lance) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Graig J. Alvarez on behalf of Clinton Moss, filed. (Alvarez, Graig) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Sperry Drilling Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24776722) filed by Clinton Moss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bremer, Lance) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sperry Drilling Services, a division of Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graig J Alvarez