This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 09:26:44 (UTC).

Mosley v. HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Mosley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00327

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Mosley

Defendants

HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated a Delaware company doing business as Popeyes

HZ Props AZ LLC a Delaware company doing business as Popeyes

Amin Dhanani

Jordan Cortez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael David Zoldan

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Jason Saul Barrat

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this entire case on May 18, 2022, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/18/2022. (AO) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#12

(#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated and HZ Props AZ LLC, d/b/a Popeyes. (LAD) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

11 #1

Affidavit

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Jordan Cortez. (LAD) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

9 #1

Affidavit

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon Amin Dhanani on 03/23/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/24/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#7

(#7) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon Jordan Cortez on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon HZ Props AZ, LLC on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#5

(#5) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20402130. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-327-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #15 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this entire case on May 18, 2022, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/18/2022. (AO) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated and HZ Props AZ LLC, d/b/a Popeyes. (LAD) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jason Mosley against HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Popeyes and HZ Props AZ, LLC d/b/a Popeyes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Jordan Cortez. (LAD) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jason Mosley against Jordan Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon Amin Dhanani on 03/23/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/24/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon Jordan Cortez on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon HZ Props AZ, LLC on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jason Mosley: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. upon HZ OPS Holdings, Inc. on 03/22/2022. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 3/23/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jordan Cortez, Amin Dhanani, HZ OPS Holdings Incorporated, HZ Props AZ LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20402130. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-327-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20402130 filed by Jason Mosley. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Saul Barrat