This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 16:39:35 (UTC).

Mosley v. Halliburton

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Mosley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Halliburton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles R. Mosley

Midland, TX 79705

Defendant

Halliburton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rachel E. Linzy

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

6 #6

Exhibit B-3 Training

6 #5

Exhibit B-2 Offer

6 #4

Exhibit B-1 Application

6 #3

Exhibit B-Declaration of Becky Applegath

6 #2

Exhibit A-1 DRP

6 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration of Melinda Miner

#6

(#6) MOTION to Compel and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Stay by Halliburton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Melinda Miner, #2 Exhibit A-1 DRP, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Becky Applegath, #4 Exhibit B-1 Application, #5 Exhibit B-2 Offer, #6 Exhibit B-3 Training)(Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E. Linzy on behalf of Halliburton. Attorney Rachel E. Linzy added to party Halliburton(pty:dft) (Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Halliburton served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (slt) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Halliburton. (se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Charles R. Mosley for Halliburton. (se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

EEOC Right to Sue Letter & Copy of Envelope

1 #1

Memo in Support

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 700016951), filed by Charles R. Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Letter & Copy of Envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Compel and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Stay by Halliburton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Melinda Miner, #2 Exhibit A-1 DRP, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Becky Applegath, #4 Exhibit B-1 Application, #5 Exhibit B-2 Offer, #6 Exhibit B-3 Training)(Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E. Linzy on behalf of Halliburton. Attorney Rachel E. Linzy added to party Halliburton(pty:dft) (Linzy, Rachel) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Halliburton served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (slt) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Halliburton. (se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Charles R. Mosley for Halliburton. (se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 700016951), filed by Charles R. Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Letter & Copy of Envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(se) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel E. Linzy