This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:12:41 (UTC).

MOSLEY v. BURGER KING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MOSLEY filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BURGER KING CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23862

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAVIS MOSLEY

Defendant

BURGER KING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Scott Norell

Attorney at Robert S. Norell P.A.

300 Nw 70Th Avenue, Suite 305

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BURGER KING CORPORATION. (rbe) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan A. Lenard recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (jc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring a FLSA Statement of Claim due by 12/9/2022. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Settlement Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TRAVIS MOSLEY. BURGER KING CORPORATION served on 12/2/2022, response/answer due 12/27/2022. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#7

(#7) Statement of: Claim by TRAVIS MOSLEY re #5 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TRAVIS MOSLEY (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated, per #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Closing Case. (ps1) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TRAVIS MOSLEY (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of: Claim by TRAVIS MOSLEY re #5 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TRAVIS MOSLEY. BURGER KING CORPORATION served on 12/2/2022, response/answer due 12/27/2022. (Norell, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring a FLSA Statement of Claim due by 12/9/2022. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Settlement Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan A. Lenard recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (jc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BURGER KING CORPORATION. (rbe) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BURGER KING CORPORATION. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16125140, filed by TRAVIS MOSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Norell, Robert) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less