This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:59:10 (UTC).

Mosley et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Mosley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Linda V. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-10470

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Khari Mosley

Chelsa Wagner

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Darryl Jones

Cadillac Hotel Holdings, LLC

Timothy Scott

Cadillac Hotel Funding, LLC

Westin Operator, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. Thomas McCarthy, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine M. Beres

Dora A. Brantley

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Hotel Folio

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Beres on behalf of Darryl Jones. (Beres, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Beres on behalf of Timothy Scott. (Beres, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Beres on behalf of Westin Operator, LLC. (Beres, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Beres on behalf of Marriott International, Inc.. (Beres, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Dora A. Brantley on behalf of Darryl Jones. (Brantley, Dora) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Dora A. Brantley on behalf of Timothy Scott. (Brantley, Dora) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dora A. Brantley on behalf of Westin Operator, LLC. (Brantley, Dora) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Dora A. Brantley on behalf of Marriott International, Inc.. (Brantley, Dora) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Westin Operator, LLC waiver sent on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (McCarthy, E.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Marriott International, Inc. waiver sent on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (McCarthy, E.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Timothy Scott waiver sent on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (McCarthy, E.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Darryl Jones waiver sent on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (McCarthy, E.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Cadillac Hotel Funding, LLC, Cadillac Hotel Holdings, LLC, Darryl Jones, Marriott International, Inc., Timothy Scott, Westin Operator, LLC* (SKra) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Chelsa Wagner, Khari Mosley against Cadillac Hotel Funding, LLC, Cadillac Hotel Holdings, LLC, Darryl Jones, Marriott International, Inc., Timothy Scott, Westin Operator, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8364639 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hotel Folio) (McCarthy, E.) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less