This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2020 at 08:15:20 (UTC).

MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC v. GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00672

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC

Defendant

GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

Indranil Mukerji

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Michael J. Ballanco

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

Ruffin B. Cordell

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Jason M. Zucchi

Attorney at Law Office of Jason M. Zucchi

3200 Rbc Plaza, 600 South Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Laura C. Whitworth

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Brian J. Livedalen

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Ave., S.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Jack R. Wilson, IV

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1000 Maine Avenue, Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Howard Hatch-Miller

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Jacob W. Buchdahl

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Arun S. Subramanian

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

John P. Lahad

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC. answer due 1/27/2020. (am) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendant has until on or before January 27, 2020 to answer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Jacob W. Buchdahl ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946299) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Mark Howard Hatch-Miller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946238) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Lahad for Arun Subramanian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12946158) by on behalf of GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898771) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Michael J. Ballanco ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898641) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Ruffin B. Cordell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12898143) by on behalf of MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to GLOBUS MEDICAL, INC.. (am) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12872679), filed by MOSKOWITZ FAMILY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBUS MEDICAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Livedalen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph V. Colaianni, Jr.