This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2022 at 16:00:55 (UTC).

Mosby v. King et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Mosby filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against King. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael P. Mills and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ashley Mosby

Defendants and Counter Claimants

TD Auto Finance LLC formerly known as DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge doing business as ReMarketing Edge

Jehlani King

Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC

AT&T Mobility Services, LLC

Huntington National Bank

Wells Fargo Bank, National Association formerly known as Wells Fargo Dealer Services doing business as Wells Fargo Auto

Fedex Exmployees Credit Union

Cingular Wireless Employee Services, LLC

American Express Company

Okpala Manneh

DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge

Capital One National Association

Trantor Management, Inc. doing business as Trantor Atlantic Lofts

Synchrony Financial

John Doe Individuals

DCFS USA LLC

Huntington Bancshares Incorporated

Wells Fargo Dealer Services

Carmax Business Services, LLC doing business as CarMax Auto Finance

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Derek D. Hopson

Attorney at HOPSON LAW GROUP

P.O. Box 266, Martin Luther King Blvd.

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

George D. Hembree, III

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 702

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Evan Nicholas Parrott

Attorney at MAYNARD, COOPER & GALE, P.C.

11 North Water Street, Suite 24290

Mobile, AL 36602

Stephen J. Bumgarner

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE, P.C.

1901 Sixth Ave N., Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

Brandon I. Dorsey

Attorney at BRANDON I. DORSEY, PLLC

P.O. Box 13427

Jackson, MS 39236-3427

Elizabeth Windsor Burton

Attorney at MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE, LLC

1022 Highland Colony Pkwy., Suite 304

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Sheryl Bey

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL

P.O. Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236

Morgan McPhail Keup

Attorney at JERNIGAN COPELAND ATTORNEYS, PLLC

970 Ebenezer Boulevard, P.O. Box 2249

Madison, MS 39130

Patrick Ryan Beckett

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

John Dollarhide

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP - Ridgeland

P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

La'Toyia Jenessa Slay

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy, Suite 1400 (39157), P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

R. Frank Springfield

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN, LLP

420 North 20Th Street, 3100 Southtrust Tower

Birmingham, AL 35203-0719

Other Attorneys

Brittan Webb Robinson

Attorney at STONE HIGGS & DREXLER

150 Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Stephanie J. Bentley

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2001 K. St. Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stephen T. Masley

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 702

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#97

(#97) ORDER dismissing without prejudice to refiling after stay is lifted #92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/28/2022. (mdkb) Modified on 2/1/2022 (jla).

#96

95 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing

#95

#94

92 #3

Exhibit C - Monthly Statements for Charge Card Account

92 #2

Exhibit B - Visa Consumer Agreement and Disclosure Form

92 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Visa Charge Card

#92

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Contract For Vehicles

1 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Return Check

#1

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER dismissing without prejudice to refiling after stay is lifted #92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/28/2022. (mdkb) Modified on 2/1/2022 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for August 30, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (def)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing) (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and AdministrativeProcedures Section 3(A)(8) states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Court staff has made the correction; Attorney will be directed to refile in the future. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) CORPORATE STATEMENT of FedEx Employees Credit Union (Robinson, Brittan) Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla). Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Robinson, Brittan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MOTION for Summary Judgment by FedEx Employees Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Visa Charge Card, #2 Exhibit B - Visa Consumer Agreement and Disclosure Form, #3 Exhibit C - Monthly Statements for Charge Card Account) (Robinson, Brittan) Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla). Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and the parties' Confidential Settlement Memos are due no later than 8/16/2021. ***PLEASE READ THE INITIAL ORDER CAREFULLY AS IT CONTAINS IMPORTANT INFORMATION RELATED TO THE SUBMISSION OF THE PROPOSED CMO AND THE CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMOS*** Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/26/2021. (jf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Entry of Default (by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC to the Clerk) filed by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ANSWER to #80 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Ashley Mosby by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer due 11/14/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/1/20. (def) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Windsor Burton on behalf of Huntington National Bank (Burton, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Huntington National Bank waiver sent on 9/10/2020. (Burton, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, (Wells Fargo Bank, National Association) Acknowledgment filed by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Bey, Sheryl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheryl Bey on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Bey, Sheryl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Unifi Equipment Finance (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, American Express Company, Bank of America Corporation, Capital One National Association, Carmax Business Services, LLC, Fedex Exmployees Credit Union, Huntington National Bank, Jehlani King, Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, Synchrony Financial, TD Auto Finance LLC, Trantor Management, Inc., Unifi Equipment Finance, Wayfair, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1843084, filed by Ashley Mosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Return Check, #2 Exhibit B - Contract For Vehicles, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Financial is a litigant

Latest cases where DCFS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Bancshares Incorporated is a litigant