This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 07:16:27 (UTC).

Morton v. Torax Medical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Morton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Torax Medical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Youlee Yim You. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur F. Morton

Defendants

Torax Medical, Inc.

Ethicon, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Nathan Eder

Joel D. Sturm

Defendant Attorneys

Aukjen Ingraham

Jeffrey S. Eden

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV00402 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8794053 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Torax Medical, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Eden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Joint Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Eden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/23/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/22/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sb) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Torax Medical, Inc., Ethicon, Inc.. (Ingraham, Aukjen) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • Docket(#9) MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on March 22, 2023. Fact discovery shall be completed by September 21, 2023. The deadline to amend pleadings is September 28, 2023. The parties shall mutually exchange expert reports by October 23, 2023. Rebuttal expert reports shall be exchanged by November, 20, 2023. Expert discovery shall be completed by December 11, 2023. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by January 11, 2024. ORDER - SETTING a five-day Jury Trial for Monday, May 6, 2024, at 09:00 a.m. in Portland Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-10 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration David Eder present as counsel for plaintiff. Aukjen Ingraham and Jeffrey Eden present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Docket(#6) Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, 3/22/2023 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Torax Medical, Inc., Ethicon, Inc.. (Ingraham, Aukjen) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/23/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/22/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sb) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joint Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Eden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV00402 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8794053 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Torax Medical, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Eden, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less