This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 08:18:43 (UTC).

Morton v. C R Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Morton filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02169

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Ava Morton

Defendants

C R Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shreedhar R Patel

Attorney at Reich & Binstock, LLP

4265 San Felipe, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The above-styled case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable United States District Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2021) (sre) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (sre) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C.R. Bard Inc filed by Valerie Ava Morton. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12200700) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Patel, Shreedhar) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE NUMBER 3:21-cv-02169-S Morton v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:21cv1035-P. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The above-styled case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable United States District Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2021) (sre) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (sre) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C.R. Bard Inc filed by Valerie Ava Morton. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12200700) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Patel, Shreedhar) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shreedhar R. Patel