This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 21:14:56 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC v. ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR and KAREN FRINK WOLF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

Referral Judge

KAREN FRINK WOLF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS E. PRATT

Attorney at KORDE & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

900 Chelmsford Street, Suite 3102

Lowell, MA 01851

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 4/27/2023) Fee due by 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Assignments, #4 Exhibit D - Demand)(tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Note

1 #2

Exhibit B - Mortgage

1 #3

Exhibit C - Assignments

1 #4

Exhibit D - Demand

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#4

(#4) DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to HUD - Attorney General, #2 Summons Issued to HUD - US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons Issued to HUD - DC)(tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

5 #1

Summons Issued to HUD - Attorney General

5 #2

Summons Issued to HUD - US Attorney's Office

5 #3

Summons Issued to HUD - DC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2755980.), filed by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC.(HOOVER, ERIKA) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to HUD - Attorney General, #2 Summons Issued to HUD - US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons Issued to HUD - DC)(tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ESTATE OF RICHARD E CARLISLE, SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 4/27/2023) Fee due by 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Assignments, #4 Exhibit D - Demand)(tcs) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less