Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2020 at 11:08:48 (UTC).

Mortera v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Mortera filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilberto Alarcon Mortera

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Weldy

Attorney at WELDY LAW FIRM, PLLC

105 North College Street

Brandon, MS 39042

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Banahan

Attorney at BRYAN, NELSON, SCHROEDER, CASTIGLIOLA & BANAHAN, -Pascagoula

P. O. Drawer 1529, 1103 Jackson Avenue

Pascagoula, MS 39568-1529

Calen J. Wills

Attorney at BRYAN, NELSON, SCHROEDER, CASTIGLIOLA & BANAHAN, -Pascagoula

P. O. Drawer 1529, 1103 Jackson Avenue

Pascagoula, MS 39568-1529

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Banahan, John) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER requiring Defendant to file answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/10/2020 (AG) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#3

(#3) State Court Record by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Banahan, John) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Calen J. Wills on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wills, Calen) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Answer to First Set of Interrogatories

1 #5

Exhibit E - Court's Order of Remand

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Farm's Memorandum

1 #3

Exhibit C - Court's Sua Sponte Order

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal filed 4/24/20

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Hancock County, Mississippi, case number 20-00047, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4313713) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal filed 4/24/20, #3 Exhibit C - Court's Sua Sponte Order, #4 Exhibit D - State Farm's Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E - Court's Order of Remand, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Answer to First Set of Interrogatories, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing: Due to a scheduling conflict with Counsel for Plaintiff's calendar, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 9/23/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel will follow all other instructions given in the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #6 . (AB) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5. Attorney is advised that this document should have been filed as an "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Answers" category. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Banahan, John) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER requiring Defendant to file answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/10/2020 (AG) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court Record by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Banahan, John) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Calen J. Wills on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wills, Calen) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Hancock County, Mississippi, case number 20-00047, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4313713) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal filed 4/24/20, #3 Exhibit C - Court's Sua Sponte Order, #4 Exhibit D - State Farm's Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E - Court's Order of Remand, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Answer to First Set of Interrogatories, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Calen J. Wills

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Banahan