This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:59:27 (UTC).

Mortenson et al v. Apollo Piping Supply, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Mortenson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Apollo Piping Supply, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.

Singer Safety Company

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

Zurn Industries, LLC

Weil McLain Company

RCH Newco II, LLC

Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.

Linde, LLC

General Engineering Development Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Cleaver Brooks

3M Company

Bell & Gossett

S.O.S. Products

Hobart Brothers Company

Goulds Pumps, Inc.

Trane U.S., Inc.

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company

Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.

82 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Matthew R. Thibodeau

Attorney at Thibodeau, Johnson & Feriancek

302 West Superior Street, Suite 800

Duluth, MN 55802

Patrick T. Tierney

Attorney at Collins, Buckley, Sauntry & Haugh PLLP

West 1100 First National Bank Building, 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-1379

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Kyle B. Mansfield

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

1200 Marquette Plaza, 250 Marquette Ave

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jon P. Parrington

Attorney at Pustorino & Parrington, PLLC

Ste. 190, 6800 France Ave. So.

Minneapolis, MN 55435-2013

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Thomas M. Stieber

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Jon R Russell

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David T. Schach

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Heather H. Neubauer

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Patrick T. Tierney

Attorney at Collins, Buckley, Sauntry & Haugh PLLP

West 1100 First National Bank Building, 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-1379

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Kyle B. Mansfield

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

1200 Marquette Plaza, 250 Marquette Ave

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jon P. Parrington

Attorney at Pustorino & Parrington, PLLC

Ste. 190, 6800 France Ave. So.

Minneapolis, MN 55435-2013

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Thomas M. Stieber

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Jon R Russell

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David T. Schach

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Heather H. Neubauer

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Other Attorneys

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, P.C.

802 1St Avenue North

Fargo, ND 58102

Jane L. Dynes

Attorney at Serkland Law Firm, P.C.

10 Roberts St., P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Brent J. Edison

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Thomas D. Jensen

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson PA

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Ave S

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joel A. Flom

Attorney at Flom Law Office, P.A.

1703 32Nd Avenue South

Fargo, ND 58103

David C. Thompson

321 Kittson Avenue, Po Box 5235

Grand Forks, ND 58201

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

#62

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#37

1 #28

Exhibit 28 - Rudolph Opp Deposition, 10/15/1991

1 #27

Exhibit 27 - James Matthews Deposition, 3/24/1982

1 #26

Exhibit 26 - James Matthews Deposition, 3/23/1982

1 #25

Exhibit 25 - J. Nodsle Deposition, 1/25/1983

1 #22

Exhibit 22 - Herbert Gartner Deposition, 8/21/1991

1 #21

Exhibit 21 - William Sornsin Deposition, 9/28/1983

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Minot Base Bid Opening Set, 5/12/1955

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Minot Air Base Gets More Funds, 3/7/1958

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - To Break Ground For Base at Minot, 7/6/55

1 #5

Exhibit Minot Air Force Base History

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2019. (DR #190719-001) (td) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#64) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per discussion at the July 19, 2019 Scheduling Conference, the Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect "The Marley-Wylain Company" as the defendant in place of "Weil-McLain Company." (AS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial Est. 10-13 Days). (AS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Discovery Motions due by 5/14/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/20/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/30/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 6/5/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 8/30/2019. Amend Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/19/2020. Threshold Motions due by 7/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2020. (AS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Contractors, Inc.. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobart Brothers Company identifying Corporate Parent Illinois Tool Works Inc. for Hobart Brothers Company.. (Schach, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Hobart Brothers Company (Schach, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oppegard, Paul) Modified on 6/7/2019 to restrict access (lh). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RCH Newco II, LLC identifying Other Affiliate H.H. Robertson Company, Other Affiliate Robertseon Ceco Corporation for RCH Newco II, LLC.. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AWT Air Company, Inc. identifying that it is a subsidiary of Aqua Alliance Inc. (Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/29/2019 to clarify docket text. NEF regenerated (am). Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct text. (rm) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENT (JS44 Civil Cover Sheet) to document #1 Notice of Removal by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 List of Defense Counsel)(rm) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (as) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Heather Neubauer by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Assignment and Case Number, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer and Defenses of Defendant CBS Corporation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer of H.B. Fuller Company, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company, #6 Exhibit 6 - Answer of Defendant Smith-Sharpe Company, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer of Research-Cottrell, Inc., #8 Exhibit 8 - Answer of RCH Newco II, LLC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Separate Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Honeywell, Inc. and Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit 10 - Answer of Defendant Trane U.S. Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Separate Answer of Grillell Corporation, #12 Exhibit 12 - Answer of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, #13 Exhibit 13 - Separate Answer of ITT Corporation (incorrectly named as Bell & Gossett), #14 Exhibit 14 - Building Sprinkler Company, Inc's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 - Answer of Foster Products Corporation, #16 Exhibit 16 - Answer of Defendant Hobart Brothers LLC, #17 Exhibit 17 - Answer of Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company, #18 Exhibit 18 - Answer to Praxair Distribution, Inc., #19 Exhibit 19 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Union Carbine Corporation, #20 Exhibit 20 - Answer of Industrial Holdings Corporation, #21 Exhibit 21 - Answer of S.O.S. Products Company, Inc., #22 Exhibit 22 - Separate Answer of Sprinkmann Son's Corporation, #23 Exhibit 23 - Separate Answer of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation, #24 Exhibit 24 - Burnham LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #25 Exhibit 25 - Separate Answer of Defendant General Engineering Development Corporation and Demand for Trial, #26 Exhibit 26 - Separate Answer of Defendant Goodrich Corporation and Demand for Trial, #27 Affidavit of Service)(as) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2019-CV-01362. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000330 filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Served on Building Sprinkler, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint (prior lawsuit), #3 Exhibit 3 - Virgil Mortenson-Work History (prior lawsuit), #4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Virgil Mortenson, 2/2/04, #5 Exhibit 5 - Minot Air Force Base History, #6 Exhibit 6 - To Break Ground For Base at Minot, 7/6/55, #7 Exhibit 7 - Kiewit Bids Low at Minot, 10/26/1955, #8 Exhibit 8 - Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids, 10/27/1955, #9 Exhibit 9 - Minot Air Base Gets More Funds, 3/7/1958, #10 Exhibit 10 - Minot Base Bid Opening Set, 5/12/1955, #11 Exhibit 11 - Public Law 534 & 301, 7/27/1954, #12 Exhibit 12 - Public Law 765 & 301, 9/1/1954, #13 Exhibit 13 - Public Law 85-685, 8/20/1958, #14 Exhibit 14 - Public Law 87-554, 7/27/1962, #15 Exhibit 15 - Minot Area Will Have ICBM Sites, 6/14/1961, #16 Exhibit 16 - Minuteman Aide is Assigned, 10/4/1961, #17 Exhibit 17 - First Minuteman Property Brought from Kief Couple, 11/24/1961, #18 Exhibit 18 - $67 Million Low on Missile Work, 12/21/1961, #19 Exhibit 19 - Minot Air Force Base Specifications, #20 Exhibit 20 - Deposition of William Sornsin, 6/30/1987, #21 Exhibit 21 - William Sornsin Deposition, 9/28/1983, #22 Exhibit 22 - Herbert Gartner Deposition, 8/21/1991, #23 Exhibit 23 - Andrew Olerud Deposition, 1/18/1983, #24 Exhibit 24 - Andrew Olerud Deposition, 12/5/1991, #25 Exhibit 25 - J. Nodsle Deposition, 1/25/1983, #26 Exhibit 26 - James Matthews Deposition, 3/23/1982, #27 Exhibit 27 - James Matthews Deposition, 3/24/1982, #28 Exhibit 28 - Rudolph Opp Deposition, 10/15/1991, #29 Exhibit 29 - Rudolph Opp Deposition, 7/18/1994, #30 Exhibit 30 - Bruce Bergson, Deposition, 7/18/2000, #31 Exhibit 31 - Andrew Olerud Deposition, 2/21/1991, #32 Exhibit 32 - Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #33 Exhibit 33 - MilSpec-C-28610, #34 Exhibit 34 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage, MIL-STD-129C, #35 Exhibit 35 - MIL-STD-129C Change of Notice 1, 2/10/1961, #36 Exhibit 36 - MIL-STD-129C Change Notice 3, #37 Exhibit 37 - Keene Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, 5/24/1990, #38 Exhibit 38 - Keene Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production, 4/13/1989, #39 Exhibit 39 - Noralf Deposition 4/6/1982)(as) Note: JS44 Civil Cover Sheet and List of Defense Counsel filed at #5 . (rm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SOS PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant