This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:20:24 (UTC).

Morse v. Kalkaska, Village of et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Morse filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kalkaska, Village of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Hala Y. Jarbou. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00444

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Hala Y. Jarbou

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aliza Morse

Defendants

Village of Kalkaska

Cole Nagy

Kalkaska, Village of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Trainor

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Amy J. DeRouin

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Defendant Attorney

Gregory R. Grant

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, PLC

310 W Front St., Ste. 221

Traverse City, MI 49684

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (DISREGARD) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Bullock, Lori) Modified text on 7/7/2021; per filing attorney, filed in incorrect case(eod) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 8/3/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 7/29/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Aliza Morse re #7 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand (Reliance) and Proof of Service by Kalkaska, Village of, Cole Nagy (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Grant on behalf of defendants Kalkaska, Village of, Cole Nagy (Grant, Gregory) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Cole Nagy served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021 (jem) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Kalkaska, Village of served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cole Nagy, Village of Kalkaska (mg) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (mg) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amy J. DeRouin on behalf of plaintiff Aliza Morse (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Aliza Morse in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6449915 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cole Nagy, Village of Kalkaska filed by Aliza Morse (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory R. Grant