Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:44:32 (UTC).

Morrow et al v. McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Morrow filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against McCurtain County Independent School District No 11. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Morrow

Defendants

McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11

Valliant Public Schools

Scott Pratt

Rachael Smith

Craig Wall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joe E. White, Jr.

Attorney at White & Weddle, PC

630 Ne 63Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Kate C. Thompson

Attorney at White & Weddle, PC

630 Ne 63Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Defendant Attorney

Matthew P. Cyran

Attorney at Rosenstein Fist & Ringold

525 S Main St, Ste 700

Tulsa, OK 74103-4500

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) Responses due by 10/1/2020(White, Joe) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(Individually) (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (White, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

16 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#16

(#16) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) (Cyran, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt by Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) Responses due by 9/17/2020(Cyran, Matthew) (Main Document 14 replaced - PDF was bad - on 9/14/2020) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew P. Cyran on behalf of All Defendants (Cyran, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Pratt (in his individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rachael Smith (in her individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kate C. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Kate) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rachael Smith(in her official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Pratt(Individually and in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Craig Wall(in his official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) (Cyran, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kimberly Morrow(Individually and as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry #18 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' shall respond to the Motion by OCTOBER 1, 2020.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) Responses due by 10/1/2020(White, Joe) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(Individually) (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (White, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) (Cyran, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt by Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) Responses due by 9/17/2020(Cyran, Matthew) (Main Document 14 replaced - PDF was bad - on 9/14/2020) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew P. Cyran on behalf of All Defendants (Cyran, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Pratt (in his individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rachael Smith (in her individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Craig Wall (in his individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kate C. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Kate) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rachael Smith(in her official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Pratt(Individually and in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Craig Wall(in his official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/24/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1385170 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (White, Joe) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt (Individually and in his official capacity), Rachael Smith (in her official capacity and Individually), Craig Wall (in his official capacity and Individually) by Kimberly Morrow (Individually and as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kimberly Morrow(Individually and as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joe E. White, Jr.