This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 09:29:01 (UTC).

MORRISON v. US APPEALS COURT et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 MORRISON filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against US APPEALS COURT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF and W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00206

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

Judge Details

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD MORRISON

Abbeville, GA 31001

Defendants

CCA-CORR-CIVIC

GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

US APPEALS COURT

GEORGIA SECRETARY OF STATE

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Cover Letter

#14

(#14) MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING appeal for want of prosecution as to #10 Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(rlw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#13

(#13) USCA Case Number 20-14208-D re #10 Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (sbd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#12

(#12) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #10 Notice of Appeal, #7 Judgment, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Judge Appealed: Judge Sands. Fee: Not Paid. (sbd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

11 #1

Main Document

#11

(#11) Letter (envelope) from Plaintiff to the Clerk regarding payment of filing fees. (sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2020: #1 Letter (sbd). Modified text on 11/10/2020 (sbd). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Motion for Summary Judgment by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw) Modified on text 11/12/2020 (rlw). (Entered: 11/04/2020)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Cover Letter

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVITS OF STATEMENTS OF CLAIMS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rlw) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT dismissing this case. (rlw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as moot #4 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/28/2020. (rlw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

1 #2

Envelope

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING appeal for want of prosecution as to #10 Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(rlw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment to US Magistrate Judge. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) USCA Case Number 20-14208-D re #10 Notice of Appeal filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (sbd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #10 Notice of Appeal, #7 Judgment, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Judge Appealed: Judge Sands. Fee: Not Paid. (sbd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter (envelope) from Plaintiff to the Clerk regarding payment of filing fees. (sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2020: #1 Letter (sbd). Modified text on 11/10/2020 (sbd). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Judgment, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for Summary Judgment by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw) Modified on text 11/12/2020 (rlw). (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVITS OF STATEMENTS OF CLAIMS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rlw) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT dismissing this case. (rlw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as moot #4 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/28/2020. (rlw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Richard Morrison requesting confirmation of his Writ of Mandamus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Copy of docket sheet mailed to him.(rlw) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Amend #1 Petition and Records Filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) WRIT OF MANDUMUS against CCA-CORR-CIVIC, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, GEORGIA SECRETARY OF STATE, US APPEALS COURT, filed by RICHARD MORRISON. (Attachments: #1 Special Notice and Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(sbd) Modified text on 10/20/2020 (sbd). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Georgia Secretary of State is a litigant