This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2020 at 09:56:06 (UTC).

Morrison v. SPS Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Morrison filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against SPS Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-06129

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Micah Morrison

Defendants

Tom Arthur

Corey Kephart

Bill Snyder

Dennis Mullin

SPS Companies, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Welfare Benefit Plan

Matt Crocker

SPS Companies, Inc.

Steel Ventrues, L.L.C., d/b/a EXLTUBE

Steel Ventures, L.L.C. doing business as EXLTUBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Goodwin

Attorney at Joseph, Hollander & Craft LLC

926 Cherry Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Christopher M. McHugh

Attorney at Joseph, Hollander & Craft LLC

926 Cherry Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Matthew Johnston

Attorney at Joseph, Hollander & Craft LLC

926 Cherry Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell E. Wood

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 W. 75Th, Ste. 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Kathryn Ann Wright

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 W. 75Th, Ste. 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Johnston on behalf of Micah Morrison (Attorney Matthew Johnston added to party Micah Morrison(pty:pla))(Johnston, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants answer due 10/27/20. Signed on 10/14/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Kathryn Ann Wright on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Tom Arthur(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Matt Crocker(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Corey Kephart(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Dennis Mullin(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party SPS Companies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party SPS Companies, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Bill Snyder(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ann Wright added to party Steel Ventures, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Wright, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendants Tom Arthur, Matt Crocker, Corey Kephart, Dennis Mullin, SPS Companies, Inc., SPS Companies, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Bill Snyder, Steel Ventures, L.L.C..(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants (Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for extension of time to file answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Tom Arthur(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Matt Crocker(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Corey Kephart(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Dennis Mullin(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party SPS Companies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party SPS Companies, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Bill Snyder(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell E. Wood added to party Steel Ventures, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andrew Joseph Goodwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7014516. Service due by 11/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodwin, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW J GOODWIN(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. McHugh