Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:20:50 (UTC).

Morrison v. Midland Funding LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Morrison filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Funding LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06468

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Morrison

Defendants

Midland Funding LLC

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Selip & Stylianou, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany N. Hardy

Attorney at Edelman Combs Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

David M. Kaplan

Attorney at David M. Kaplan, Attorney-at-Law

46 Helmsford Way

Penfield, NY 14526

Defendant Attorneys

Han Sheng Beh

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Ellen Beth Silverman

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Andrew Christopher Sayles

Attorney at Connell Foley LLP

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#14

(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on consent by Selip & Stylianou, LLP.(Sayles, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Sayles on behalf of Selip & Stylianou, LLP (Sayles, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Morrison. Midland Funding LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/30/2020. (SR) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER RE #1 COMPLAINT - ON CONSENT] by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#9

(#9) Letter filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC as to Selip & Stylianou, LLP, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC [LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER RE #1 COMPLAINT - ON CONSENT]. (Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #8

Proposed Summons Selip & Stylianou, LLP

1 #7

Proposed Summons to Midland Credit Management, Inc.

1 #6

Proposed Summons to Midland Funding, LLC

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Appendix D

1 #3

Appendix C

1 #2

Appendix B

1 #1

Appendix A

#1

(#9) Letter filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC as to Selip & Stylianou, LLP, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC [LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER RE #1 COMPLAINT - ON CONSENT]. (Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants now have until 10/02/2020 to respond. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 08/28/2020. (SFR) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Having obtained consent from Plaintiff, Defendant Selip & Stylianou, LLP's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Selip & Stylianou, LLP's answer is now due 9/8/2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/10/2020. (BJJ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on consent by Selip & Stylianou, LLP.(Sayles, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Sayles on behalf of Selip & Stylianou, LLP (Sayles, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Morrison. Midland Funding LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/30/2020. (SR) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER RE #1 COMPLAINT - ON CONSENT] by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: regarding #9 Letter: this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (CGJ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC as to Selip & Stylianou, LLP, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC [LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER RE #1 COMPLAINT - ON CONSENT]. (Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Han Sheng Beh on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Beh, Han Sheng) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Beth Silverman on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Silverman, Ellen) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Morrison. Selip & Stylianou, LLP served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC, Selip & Stylianou, LLP. (JD) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Kaplan on behalf of Jessica Morrison (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Jessica Morrison (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3892680, filed by Jessica Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons to Midland Funding, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons to Midland Credit Management, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons Selip & Stylianou, LLP)(Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selip & Stylianou LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant