This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 10:52:12 (UTC).

Eric Morris v. Sun Pharma Global Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Eric Morris filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sun Pharma Global Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10441

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Morris

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Sun Pharma Global Inc.

Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc..

CVS Health Corporation

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark James Skapik

Geralyn L. Skapik

Blair Jeffrey Berkley

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Jay Bauch

Marion V Mauch

Clem C. Trischler

Jason M. Reefer

Marissa Ann Warren

 

Court Documents

30 #3

Proposed Order

30 #2

Declaration of Danial J.Bauch

30 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#30

#29

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

#27

#26

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Luker Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit Salem Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit Bauch Declaration

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Danial J.Bauch, #3 Proposed Order) (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying CVS Health Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Warren, Marissa) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. filed by Defendant, CVS PHARMACY, INC. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Warren, Marissa) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 13, 2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of August 30, 2021; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of September 6, 2021; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for October 15, 2021, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of November 9, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for January 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc... (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' responses to the Court's Order to Show Cause dated December 3, 2020. (Dkt. No. #17 #18 #19 .) Both the plaintiff and the defendants state that a tag along action should not be filed in the Multidistrict Litigation currently pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Based on the current record and the parties' beliefs that this District is the most convenient venue to litigate this action, the Court tentatively concludes that the parties have made a sufficient showing to discharge the Order to Show Cause. This finding is without prejudice to any party or the Court raising the issue of filing a tag along action in the future. (lom) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #20 by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court hereby orders that Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Compliant is extended to January 8, 2021. There will be no further extensions. (lom) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clem C. Trischler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29105357) filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clem C. Trischler. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Eric Morris in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/31/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV33228 Receipt No: ACACDC-29012074 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bauch Declaration, #2 Exhibit Salem Declaration, #3 Exhibit Luker Declaration) (Attorney Daniel Jay Bauch added to party Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bauch, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less