This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2020 at 09:19:39 (UTC).

Morris v. Prada USA Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Morris filed an Other lawsuit against Prada USA Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-10591

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Morris

Defendant

Prada USA Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Lawrence Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

L Andrew Stern Riccio

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

452 Fifth Avenue

Ny, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or otherwise respond through and including January 21, 2020 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from L Andrew S. Riccio dated December 17, 2019. Document filed by Prada USA Corp..(Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by L Andrew Stern Riccio on behalf of Prada USA Corp.. (Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Prada USA Corp. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Registered Agent. Document filed by Michele Morris. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prada USA Corp.. (jgo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michele Morris. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18072279)Document filed by Michele Morris.(Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Prada USA Corp. may have until 1/21/20 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or otherwise respond through and including January 21, 2020 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from L Andrew S. Riccio dated December 17, 2019. Document filed by Prada USA Corp..(Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by L Andrew Stern Riccio on behalf of Prada USA Corp.. (Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Prada USA Corp. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Registered Agent. Document filed by Michele Morris. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prada USA Corp.. (jgo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michele Morris. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18072279)Document filed by Michele Morris.(Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRADA USA INC. DBA MIU MIU is a litigant