This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:47:52 (UTC).

Morris v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Morris filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01196

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittney Morris

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinette G Kent

Attorney at Kent Law Offices

3219 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 588

Phoenix, AZ 85018

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brittney Morris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/04/2021 to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC . (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 10/07/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/09/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/09/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19650965. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1196-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Brittney Morris. (Kent, Trinette) (MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19650965 filed by Brittney Morris. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brittney Morris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/04/2021 to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC . (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 10/07/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/09/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/09/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19650965. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1196-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Brittney Morris. (Kent, Trinette) (MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19650965 filed by Brittney Morris. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trinette G Kent