This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 11:02:00 (UTC).

Morris v. Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Morris filed an Other lawsuit against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Morris

Defendant

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maureen M Johnson

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman LLP

1700 Southwest Blvd

Tulsa, OK 74107

Frank W Frasier, III

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman LLP

1700 Southwest Blvd

Tulsa, OK 74107

Defendant Attorney

Carri A Remillard

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), upon the date of the filing, the Stipulation of Dismissal [Doc. No. 11] operates on its own terms as a voluntary dismissal without prejudice of the above-captioned case, with each party to bear his or its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/24/2021.(nv) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patrick Morris. (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss. Defendant is ordered to file its Amended Motion to Dismiss within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/04/2021. (nv) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss by Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Carri A Remillard on behalf of Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Morris. Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department served on 2/5/2021. (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department filed by Patrick Morris.(Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt for Money Received from Patrick Morris in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500083865 regarding #1 Complaint. (knt) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. (em) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department filed by Patrick Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank W Frasier, III