This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2020 at 11:30:37 (UTC).

Morris v. Diversey, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Morris filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Diversey, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erik Lee Morris

Defendant

Diversey, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C. Kiel Garella

Attorney at Garella Law, P.C.

409 East Boulevard

Charlotte, NC 28203

Defendant Attorneys

Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 North Tryon Street, Suite 4150

Charlotte, NC 28202

Katelyn Whitney McCombs

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

635 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/27/2020. (brl) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Whitney McCombs on behalf of Diversey, Inc. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diversey, Inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Diversey, Inc..(Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Diversey, Inc. answer due 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/5/2020. (tmg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Diversey, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Jerry). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Howard Walters, Jr on behalf of Diversey, Inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Diversey, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Diversey, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4496348), filed by Erik Lee Morris.(Garella, C.) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (rth). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSEY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Kiel Garella