This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:36:39 (UTC).

Morris v. Concordia Parish Correctional Facility et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Morris filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Concordia Parish Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginald T Morris

Lafayette, LA 70502

Defendants

Concordia Parish Correctional Facility

Unknown Transportation Officer

Nurse Patricia

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DUPLICATE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald T Morris. (IFP granted on 3/1/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

9 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/1/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts officer page filed by Reginald T Morris regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

5 #1

IFP Application

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Memorandum / Brief

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Concordia Parish Correctional Facility, Patricia, Unknown Transportation Officer filed by Reginald T Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DUPLICATE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald T Morris. (IFP granted on 3/1/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER from Plaintiff to Court regarding accounts officer page in civil action 19-230, receipt date of R&R in civil action 18-1322. Requesting copy work and additional forms. Clerk sent copy work letter, 1983 & ifp forms, and docket sheets in both cases on 3/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/1/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts officer page filed by Reginald T Morris regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/27/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald T Morris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 2/26/2019 to reflect submission as Deficient(Williams, L). Modified to remove deficiency notation on 2/28/2019 (Haik, K). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Concordia Parish Correctional Facility, Patricia, Unknown Transportation Officer filed by Reginald T Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.