This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 08:10:25 (UTC).

Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Morris filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03047

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antoinette Morris

Brooklyn, NY 11226

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Dara A Olds

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before 7/8/2019. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by 8/8/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross- motion, by 8/22/2019; and Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by 9/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 6/4/2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court grants in part and denies in part the Commissioner's request for an extension of time: the administrative record shall be served and filed on or before August 7, 2019; the Commissioner's motion shall be served on or before October 7, 2019; plaintiff's opposition shall be served on or before November 7, 2019; and the Commissioner's reply, if any, shall be served and filed on or before November 21, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/7/2019 (Morel, Christopher) (Entered: 07/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File administrative record and respectfully requesting approval of the proposed amended briefing schedule by Commissioner of Social Security. (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before 7/8/2019. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by 8/8/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross- motion, by 8/22/2019; and Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by 9/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 6/4/2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/24/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoinette Morris. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Antoinette Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.