This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2020 at 08:25:27 (UTC).

Morris v. Charter Communications, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Morris filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Charter Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Morris

Defendant

Charter Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David B. Mour

Attorney at Law Office of David B. Mour

513 S. Second Street

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Briana Lathon

Attorney at Stoll, Keenon & Ogden, PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, 2000 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202-2874

Culver V. Halliday

Attorney at Stoll, Keenon & Ogden, PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, 2000 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202-2874

Briana N. Lathon

Attorney at Stoll, Keenon & Ogden, PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, 2000 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202-2874

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Communications, LLC.(Halliday, Culver) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

4 #4

Data Form

4 #3

PHV Info

4 #2

Attorney Admission Packet

4 #1

ECF Registration Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Briana Lathon by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charter Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, LLC. (CBD) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Trimble Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00165, filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4563150) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Answer to Complaint (SCD) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Note re #4 Notice to Attorney Briana Lathom: Clerk rec'd application for admission 1/15/2020. Counsel may disregard the Attorney Notice. (CBD) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Communications, LLC.(Halliday, Culver) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Briana Lathon by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charter Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, LLC. (CBD) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Trimble Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00165, filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4563150) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CBD) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Mour