This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2022 at 07:33:30 (UTC).

Morris v. Brighton Area School District et al

Case Summary

On April 29, 2022, Ryan Morris, (“Plaintiff”), represented by Zachary T. Runyan of Marko Law, PLLC, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Brighton Area School District, Dr. Matthew Outlaw,  Gavin Johnson, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchionim, Mrs. Levine, and John Doe 1-10 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory and punitive damages for alleged education discrimination. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, with Judges Paul D. Borman and Anthony P. Patti presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “On or about May 10, 2019, Troy Maynor, Jr., a student at Brighton High School, texted Plaintiff Ryan Morris asking her to stay after school and meet him at ‘Pooh’s corner’, which was located in Brighton High School’s building.”

Plaintiff then claimed, “Ms. Morris stayed after school that day and went to ‘Pooh’s corner’. While waiting near the bathroom, a teacher noticed Ms. Morris loitering in the hallway.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “The teacher took no action despite being aware of Plaintiff’s disabilities and Plaintiff’s common practice of riding the bus to and from school. Instead, the teacher left Ms. Morris alone in the hallway and left the school building.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Maynor tricked Ms. Morris into going into one of Defendant Brighton High School’s bathrooms.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “In the bathroom, Maynor had sex with Ms. Morris against her will.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Defendant Brighton Public Schools had a duty to protect its students, which was breached when it failed to protect Ms. Morris from sexual assault, sexual abuse, and harassment from students.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “In or around May 2019, prior to Morris’ sexual assault, Brighton school officials caught Maynor having sex with another student, Destiny in the same bathroom.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “On August 28, 2019, Brighton held an expulsion hearing related to Maynor. The hearing panel consisted of a member of the District’s Board of Education and four administrators. They recommended Maynor be reinstated but suspended pending the outcome of the criminal investigation by law enforcement.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “As a result of this sexual assault and retaliation, Ms. Morris has suffered and continues to suffer severe emotional damage.”

Plaintiff presented eleven claims for relief, including claims for the discrimination, retaliation, harassment, and sex discrimination under violation of the Persons with Disabilities Civil Rights Act. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested an award for damages for emotional distress, pain and suffering, exemplary damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest and attorneys’ fees and expenses.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10925

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul D. Borman

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Morris

Defendants

Brighton Area School District

Dr. Matthew Outlaw

Gavin Johnson

Jody Renicker

Jennifer Sprys-Tellner

Henry Vecchioni

Levine

John Doe 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary T. Runyan

Attorney at Marko Law, PLLC

1300 Broadway Street, Ste Fifth Floor

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8894134 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (KBro) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *John Doe 1-10* (KBro) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brighton Area School District waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gavin Johnson waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Levine waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Matthew Outlaw waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jody Renicker waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jennifer Sprys-Tellner waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Henry Vecchioni waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of Brighton Area School District, Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of Brighton Area School District, Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 8/18/2022; Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2022 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 8/18/2022; Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2022 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of Brighton Area School District, Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of Brighton Area School District, Gavin Johnson, Levine, Matthew Outlaw, Jody Renicker, Jennifer Sprys-Tellner, Henry Vecchioni. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Henry Vecchioni waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jennifer Sprys-Tellner waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jody Renicker waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Matthew Outlaw waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Levine waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gavin Johnson waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brighton Area School District waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *John Doe 1-10* (KBro) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (KBro) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for John Doe 1-10. (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Zachary T. Runyan re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KBro) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8894134 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Runyan, Zachary) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levine is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis M. Comstock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J Mullins