This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:04:24 (UTC).

MORRIS v. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 MORRIS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03008

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN LYNN MORRIS

Defendants

WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC

BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING

CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

YINAN MA

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, S/128

Bensalem, PA 19020

JULIA W. CLARK

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorneys

JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney P.C.

Two Liberty Place, 50 South 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

KELSEY BEERER

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

Two Liberty Place, 50 S. 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. Amendment to #4 Waiver of Service Executed, WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by FHC Property Management LLC, incorrectly identified as Blue Harbour Senior Living. Waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELSEY BEERER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(BEERER, KELSEY) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (MA, YINAN) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING, CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP, WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13661199.), filed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (MA, YINAN) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of KAREN LYNN MORRIS (CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED DOCUMENT by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. Amendment to #4 Waiver of Service Executed, WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by FHC Property Management LLC, incorrectly identified as Blue Harbour Senior Living. Waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELSEY BEERER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(BEERER, KELSEY) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER on behalf of BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAREN LYNN MORRIS. (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING, CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP, WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13661199.), filed by KAREN LYNN MORRIS.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Summons Issued as to BLUE HARBOR SENIOR LIVING, CSW ARBOUR SQUARE I, LP, WARD SENIOR CARE, LLC. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/11/19 (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.