Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:38:06 (UTC).

Morris et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Morris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Connie Jo Morris

Johnny Morris

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Walmart INC

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter #593

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Andrew Tanner, Jr.

Attorney at Farrar & Hennesy

P.O. Box 770

Douglas, GA 31534-1325

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L. Miller

Attorney at Drew, Eckl & Farnham, LLP - Atlanta

303 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3500

Atlanta, GA 30308

Carrie Coleman

Attorney at Drew, Eckl & Farnham, LLP - BWK

777 Gloucester Street, Suite 305

Brunswick, GA 31520

Garret W. Meader

Attorney at Drew, Eckl & Farnham, LLP - BWK

777 Gloucester Street, Suite 305

Brunswick, GA 31520

Elissa Blache Haynes

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham, LLP

303 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 3500

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. Responses due by 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meader, Garret) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Coleman on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC (Coleman, Carrie) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#10

(#10) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Connie Jo Morris, Johnny Morris. (Tanner, John) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#9

(#9) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Tanner, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tanner, John) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Haynes, Elissa) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Garret W. Meader on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Miller, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC.(Miller, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/6/2020. (csr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A: Service of Process Transmittal, Sheriff's Entry of Service, Sum

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from The Superior Court of Coffee County, Georgia, case number SUS2020000001. (Filing fee paid on 3/5/2020 - $ 400.00; receipt number 113J-2797142). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Sheriff's Entry of Service, Summons, Complaint, Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission to Defendants, Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendants, Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants and Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 3/6/2020 (csr). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Consent MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality Order , #12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ca) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. Responses due by 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meader, Garret) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Coleman on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC (Coleman, Carrie) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Connie Jo Morris, Johnny Morris. (Tanner, John) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Tanner, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tanner, John) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Haynes, Elissa) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Garret W. Meader on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC. (Miller, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart INC.(Miller, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Re-file any Pending Motions Previously Filed due by 3/20/2020. (csr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 3/13/20. Plaintiff's Counsel Notice of Appearance due by 3/16/2020. (csr) Modified on 3/6/2020 (csr). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (csr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/6/2020. (csr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from The Superior Court of Coffee County, Georgia, case number SUS2020000001. (Filing fee paid on 3/5/2020 - $ 400.00; receipt number 113J-2797142). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Sheriff's Entry of Service, Summons, Complaint, Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission to Defendants, Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendants, Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants and Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 3/6/2020 (csr). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter #593 is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garret W. Meader