This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2022 at 12:40:12 (UTC).

Morris et al v. First Interstate Bank

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Morris filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against First Interstate Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald W. Molloy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald W. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandy Morris

Brenda Gray

Defendant

First Interstate Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Christopher Edwards

A. Clifford Edwards

John William Edwards

Triel D. Culver

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Demko

Mark D. Parker

Stuart M Richter

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #42 Findings and Recommendations, are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's #26 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This matter is remanded to the Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines are VACATED and pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/3/2022. (EMH) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#42

(#42) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiffs Motion to Remand now being unopposed, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Doc. 26) be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/14/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#41

(#41) MOTION to Withdraw #35 Response to Motion to remand. Stuart M Richter appearing for Defendant First Interstate Bank Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#40

(#40) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is stayed and the parties shall have until December 7, 2021 to finalize the settlement of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/8/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

35 #3

Declaration of Heather Koo

35 #2

Declaration of Josh Botnen

35 #1

Declaration of Stuart M. Richter

#35

#26

2 #33

Exhibit Motion to Amend Complaint

2 #27

Exhibit Order denying dismissal

2 #21

Exhibit Response re Amend Complaint

2 #4

Exhibit Notice of Substitution

1 #4

State Court Second Amended Complaint

1 #3

State Court Amended Complaint

1 #2

State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

90 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket***Staff notes: Federal case file inc docket sheet and original state court file electronically returned to Yellowstone County, via email case file transfer. Signed copy of return receipt requested. 1/10/2022 Zipped File to large to send electronically - Case file downloaded on thumbdrive and mailed to YC with receipt. (EMH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #1 Return Receipt) (EMH). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #42 Findings and Recommendations, are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's #26 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This matter is remanded to the Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines are VACATED and pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/3/2022. (EMH) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiffs Motion to Remand now being unopposed, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Doc. 26) be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/14/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION to Withdraw #35 Response to Motion to remand. Stuart M Richter appearing for Defendant First Interstate Bank Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Settlement Deadline due by 12/7/2021, (HEG) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is stayed and the parties shall have until December 7, 2021 to finalize the settlement of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/8/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Finalization of Settlement Triel D. Culver appearing for Plaintiffs Brenda Gray, Brandy Morris Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Culver, Triel) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) REPLY BRIEF in Support re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Brenda Gray, Brandy Morris. (Culver, Triel) Modified on 9/3/2021 to change doc title (ACC). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER: The parties have filed a second joint motion for extension of time for Defendant First Interstate Bank to respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. (Doc. 36.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by October 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/31/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Stuart M. Richter appearing for Defendant First Interstate Bank Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Richter, Stuart) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: First Interstate Bank answer due 8/31/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 joint motion for extension of time for Defendant First Interstate Bank to respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by August 31, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/14/2021. (HEG) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Mark D. Parker appearing for Defendant First Interstate Bank Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Parker, Mark) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by First Interstate Bank re #2 Notice (Other),,,,,, of Filings and Service of Notice of Removal in State Court (Parker, Mark) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Mark D. Parker, John William Edwards, A. Clifford Edwards, Triel D. Culver, A. Christopher Edwards. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/26/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #2 Notice (Other),,,,, of Stuart M. Richter in Support of First Interstate Bank's Notice of Removal by First Interstate Bank. (Parker, Mark) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Interstate Bank. (Parker, Mark) Modified on 7/9/2021 to add text (ACC). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Interstate Bank re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Substitute, #4 Exhibit Notice of Substitution, #5 Exhibit Motion to Extend Time, #6 Exhibit Order re Extend Time, #7 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit Brief re Dismissal, #9 Exhibit Richter pro hac vice app, #10 Exhibit Demko pro hac vice app, #11 Exhibit Response Brief re Dismissal, #12 Exhibit Notice of Supp Authority, #13 Exhibit Order Set Hearing, #14 Exhibit Reply Memo re Dismissal, #15 Exhibit Order re Demko, #16 Exhibit Order re Richter, #17 Exhibit Motion to Vacate, #18 Exhibit Order re Vacate, #19 Exhibit Motion re Amend Complaint, #20 Exhibit Brief re Amend Complaint, #21 Exhibit Response re Amend Complaint, #22 Exhibit Kaliel pro hac vice app, #23 Exhibit Minute Entry, #24 Exhibit Motion re Kaliel, #25 Exhibit Reply re Amend Complaint, #26 Exhibit Order re Kaliel, #27 Exhibit Order denying dismissal, #28 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit Request for Scheduling Conf, #30 Exhibit Answer to Amend Complaint, #31 Exhibit Order Set Scheduling Conf, #32 Exhibit Scheduling Order, #33 Exhibit Motion to Amend Complaint, #34 Exhibit 2nd Amend Complaint, #35 Exhibit Order re 2nd Amend Complaint, #36 Exhibit Confirm Notice re Mediation, #37 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Mark) Modified on 7/9/2021 to add "amended"(ACC). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketFiling fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2693170 (AMC) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CASE NUMBER IS CV-21-76-BLG-SPW-TJC) by First Interstate Bank from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-20-0528. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Second Amended Complaint) (AMC) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less