This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 08:29:46 (UTC).

Moronta v. ADL Enterprises et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Moronta filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADL Enterprises. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02754

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luigi Moronta

Defendants

ADL Enterprises

Manuel Guerro Victoria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Elefterakis

Attorney at Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek P.C.

80 Pine Street, 38Th Flr.

New York, NY 10005

Michael Scott Marron

Attorney at Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street 38Th Floor, 10005

New York, NY 10005

Faizan H. Ghaznavi

Attorney at Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorney

Tomas Blaquera Lim

Attorney at Leary, Bride, Mergner & Bongiovanni, P.A.

7 Ridgedale Ave

Cedar Knolls, NJ 07927

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/1/2020. Plaintiff's initial disclosures must be completed by July 8, 2020, including HIPAA authorizations for all medical providers. The parties may amend the pleadings and/or add new parties as of right by July 31, 2020. By September 30, 2020, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting a settlement conference. Fact discovery to be completed by December 18, 2020. Plaintiff's medical expert disclosures must be served by November 30, 2020, and defendants' medical expert disclosures must be served by January 15, 2021. Schedules for the completion of expert discovery and dispositive motions are deferred. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#10

(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order (JOINT) by Luigi Moronta (Marron, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott Marron on behalf of Luigi Moronta (aty to be noticed) (Marron, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Faizan H. Ghaznavi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ghaznavi, Faizan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY QUESTIONNAIRES (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on July 1, 2020 @ 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by June 30, 2020.*** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/23/2020. (LK) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

1 #10

Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I - Guerro Victoria Declaration

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Damages Demand

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D- Guerro Victoria AOS

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - ADL AOS

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer and Demands

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 525367/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12956816) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer and Demands, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - ADL AOS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Guerro Victoria AOS, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Damages Demand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Responses to Damages Demand, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Notice to State Court, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - ADL Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Guerro Victoria Declaration, #10 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/1/2020. Plaintiff's initial disclosures must be completed by July 8, 2020, including HIPAA authorizations for all medical providers. The parties may amend the pleadings and/or add new parties as of right by July 31, 2020. By September 30, 2020, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting a settlement conference. Fact discovery to be completed by December 18, 2020. Plaintiff's medical expert disclosures must be served by November 30, 2020, and defendants' medical expert disclosures must be served by January 15, 2021. Schedules for the completion of expert discovery and dispositive motions are deferred. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order (JOINT) by Luigi Moronta (Marron, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott Marron on behalf of Luigi Moronta (aty to be noticed) (Marron, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Faizan H. Ghaznavi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ghaznavi, Faizan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY QUESTIONNAIRES (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on July 1, 2020 @ 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by June 30, 2020.*** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/23/2020. (LK) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ADL Enterprises, Manuel Guerro Victoria from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 525367/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12956816) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer and Demands, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - ADL AOS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Guerro Victoria AOS, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Damages Demand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Responses to Damages Demand, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Notice to State Court, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - ADL Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Guerro Victoria Declaration, #10 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Lim, Tomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Marron

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Elefterakis