This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:32:01 (UTC).

Morningstar v. American International Group

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Morningstar filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American International Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael P. Mills and Jane M. Virden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D.

Jackson, MS 39211

Defendant

American International Group

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D. filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (jla)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Supplement) #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (jla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2022: #1 Envelope) (jla).

7 #4

Exhibit

7 #3

Exhibit

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (jla)

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D.. (jla)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Consent to Receive Documents Electronically (jwr)

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/27/22. (jla)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D. filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Supplement) #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (jla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2022: #1 Envelope) (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D.. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Consent to Receive Documents Electronically (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D., #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PH.D. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/27/22. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Akecheta Morningstar, PHD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant