This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:57:42 (UTC).

Morman v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Morman filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Jennifer Valencia Morman

Chattanooga, TN 37403

Appellees

United States Trustee

Douglas R. Johnson

Chattanooga, TN 37402-2941

Interested Party

Appeal Whittenburg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas Blake Foster

Attorney at U S Department of Justice (Chattanooga USAO)

1110 Market Street, Suite 515

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Paul A. Randolph

Attorney at Department of Justice

200 Jefferson Ave., Suite 400

Memphis, TN 38103

Ramona D Elliott

Attorney at Department of Justice

441 G Street, N.W., Suite 6150

Washington, DC 20548

P. Matthew Sutko

Attorney at Department of Justice

441 G Street, N.W., Suite 6150

Washington, DC 20548

Beth Ann Levene

Attorney at Department of Justice

441 G Street, N.W., Suite 6150

Washington, DC 20548

Carrie Ann Rohrscheib

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

519 Rittenhouse Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20011

Douglas R Johnson

Attorney at Johnson, Mulroony & Coleman, PC

428 Mccallie Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37402-2941

Interested Party Attorney

Appeal Whittenburg

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Jennifer Valencia Morman. (AWS) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18

#10

(#10) Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Removing Non-Filing Attorneys) by United States Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 14), #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18))(Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorneys,P. Matthew Sutko, Ramona D Elliott, and Paul. A. Randolph not registered for CM/ECF. Please register for CM/ECF. requirements due by 5/28/2019. (BDG)Notice mailed to P. Matthew Sutko, Ramona D Elliott, and Paul. A. Randolph. (Entered: 05/20/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 14)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 14), #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18))(Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of United States Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

6 #1

Other

#6

(#6) Transmittal of Record on Appeal by Jennifer Valencia Morman re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Other)(BDG) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/16/19. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/16/19. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

1 #1

Other Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-bk- 14461, filed by Jennifer Valencia Morman. Designation due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case)(aws, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Jennifer Valencia Morman. (AWS) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Jennifer Valencia Morman. (AWS) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Removing Non-Filing Attorneys) by United States Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 14), #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18))(Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorneys,P. Matthew Sutko, Ramona D Elliott, and Paul. A. Randolph not registered for CM/ECF. Please register for CM/ECF. requirements due by 5/28/2019. (BDG)Notice mailed to P. Matthew Sutko, Ramona D Elliott, and Paul. A. Randolph. (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Dismissing Case (Doc. No. 14), #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting in part Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. No. 18))(Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of United States Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Transmittal of Record on Appeal by Jennifer Valencia Morman re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Other)(BDG) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/16/19. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/16/19. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/16/19. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (aws, ) Mailed to Jennifer Morman. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-bk- 14461, filed by Jennifer Valencia Morman. Designation due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case)(aws, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less