This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 08:26:27 (UTC).

Morici v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Morici filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gina L Simms and Theodore D. Chuang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02290

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gina L Simms

Theodore D. Chuang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daryn S Morici

Defendants

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Patrick McNichol

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

1809 Plain View Road

Henrico, VA 23238

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo

3925 Chain Bridge Road Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorneys

Robert J. Schuckit

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Syed Mohsin Reza

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

401 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

James Robert Billings Kang

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca Suzanne Bjork

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Robert Billings Kang terminated. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/20/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Suzanne Bjork on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bjork, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time; response to Complaint is due 11/17/2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/19/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#21

(#21) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Schuckit, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#17

(#17) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Schuckit on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Schuckit, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#8

(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/23/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daryn S Morici. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daryn S Morici. Trans Union, LLC served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Daryn S Morici (McNichol, James) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#4

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Robert Billings Kang terminated. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/20/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Suzanne Bjork on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bjork, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time; response to Complaint is due 11/17/2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/19/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Schuckit, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC's answer is now due 11/15/2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/29/2021. (nrs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Billings Kang, James) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Schuckit on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Schuckit, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/23/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing Daryn S Morici to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/29/2021 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. This Order shall be vacated if Daryn S Morici files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daryn S Morici. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daryn S Morici. Trans Union, LLC served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021.(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Daryn S Morici (McNichol, James) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/7/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Daryn S Morici or counsel for Daryn S Morici are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/21/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9478344.), filed by Daryn S Morici. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Summons for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #4 Summons for Trans Union, LLC)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant