This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:35:27 (UTC).

Morgan, Zachary v. Lindus Construction, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Morgan, Zachary filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Lindus Construction, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachary Morgan

Defendants

Lindus Construction, Inc.

Crush City Construction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James A. Walcheske

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi, LLC

Suite 205, 200 S. Executive Drive, Suite 101

Brookfield, WI 53005

Scott Stanton Luzi

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi, LLC

200 S. Executive Drive, Suite 101

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Richard Revnew

Attorney at Seaton, Peters & Revnew, P.A.

7300 Metro Boulevard, Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55439

Martin Kappenman

Attorney at Seaton, Peters & Revnew, P.A.

7300 Metro Blvd., Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55439

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Motion to Admit Martin Kappenman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2411097.) by Defendants Crush City Construction, LLC, Lindus Construction, Inc. (Kappenman, Martin) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Crush City Construction, LLC. Crush City Construction, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lindus Construction, Inc. Lindus Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Richard Revnew for Defendants Crush City Construction, LLC, Lindus Construction, Inc. (Revnew, Thomas) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Smith and Pressley Consent Forms

#6

(#6) Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Zachary Morgan, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith and Pressley Consent Forms) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Crush City Construction, LLC. (arw) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zachary Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form, #2 Summons) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lindus Construction, Inc. (arw) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Walcheske for Plaintiff Zachary Morgan. (Walcheske, James) Modified on 1/11/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lindus Construction, Inc. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2390874, filed by Zachary Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Martin Kappenman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/19/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to Admit Martin Kappenman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2411097.) by Defendants Crush City Construction, LLC, Lindus Construction, Inc. (Kappenman, Martin) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Crush City Construction, LLC. Crush City Construction, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lindus Construction, Inc. Lindus Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Richard Revnew for Defendants Crush City Construction, LLC, Lindus Construction, Inc. (Revnew, Thomas) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Zachary Morgan, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith and Pressley Consent Forms) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Crush City Construction, LLC. (arw) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zachary Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form, #2 Summons) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Lindus Construction, Inc. (arw) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Walcheske for Plaintiff Zachary Morgan. (Walcheske, James) Modified on 1/11/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lindus Construction, Inc. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2390874, filed by Zachary Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Morgan Consent to Join Form, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Walcheske, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.