This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 09:43:52 (UTC).

Morgan v. Regions Bank, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Morgan filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Regions Bank, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell G. Vineyard and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tatyana Morgan

Defendant

Regions Bank, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas F. Martin

Attorney at Martin & Martin, LLP

P.O. Box 1070

Tucker, GA 30085-1070

Defendant Attorney

Tashwanda Pinchback Dixon

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP-Atl

Suite 700, 30 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3036

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/14/2020. (dmb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation for Regions Bank, Inc.. (Dixon, Tashwanda) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Regions Bank, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/8/2021.(Dixon, Tashwanda) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#6

(#6) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Regions Bank, Inc. Answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/25/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Regions Bank, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Dixon, Tashwanda) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#3

(#3) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Regions Bank, Inc.. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10088017) filed by Tatyana Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/14/2020. (dmb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation for Regions Bank, Inc.. (Dixon, Tashwanda) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Regions Bank, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/8/2021.(Dixon, Tashwanda) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Regions Bank, Inc. Answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/25/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Regions Bank, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Dixon, Tashwanda) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Regions Bank, Inc.. (rsh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10088017) filed by Tatyana Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less