This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 09:49:33 (UTC).

Morgan v. Reclamation District 2113 et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Morgan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Reclamation District 2113. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01942

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynann Morgan

Defendants

Paul Edwards

Reclamation District 2113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John-Paul Singh Deol

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Harmeet Kaur Dhillon

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Burns

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission St., Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christopher J. Truxler

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2350

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #3

VDRP

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Paul Edwards, Reclamation District 2113. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Reclamation District 2113. (Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2020-1909 by all Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9144220) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Truxler, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John-Paul Singh Deol

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harmeet K Dhillon