Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:34:35 (UTC).

Morgan v. Lee Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Morgan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lee Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00419

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathan Morgan

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America

Lee Company

Cigna Group Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dewey Russell Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Law Firm

138 S Cannon Avenue

Murfreesboro, TN 37129

Defendant Attorney

Marcie Bradley

Attorney at Robinson, Smith & Wells

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No. 10). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/16/19. (af) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER: On July 11, 2019, the parties filed a joint stipulation of dismissal. ( #10 ) The initial case management conference set for August 5, 2019 is CANCELLED. There is nothing further to be done in this matter by the undersigned. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to return the file to the District Judge for his consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/11/19. (gb) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bradley, Marcie) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie Bradley on behalf of Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America (Bradley, Marcie) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/18/2019. (gb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/22/2019. (mg) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#6

(#6) RECEIPT #34675054905 in the amount of $400 re #1 Complaint. (gb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (gb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Nathan Morgan. (Filing fee paid $400) Service copies will be returned by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No. 10). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/16/19. (af) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: On July 11, 2019, the parties filed a joint stipulation of dismissal. ( #10 ) The initial case management conference set for August 5, 2019 is CANCELLED. There is nothing further to be done in this matter by the undersigned. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to return the file to the District Judge for his consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/11/19. (gb) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bradley, Marcie) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Marcie Bradley. (gb) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie Bradley on behalf of Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America (Bradley, Marcie) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS returned executed. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/18/2019. (gb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/22/2019. (mg) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RECEIPT #34675054905 in the amount of $400 re #1 Complaint. (gb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons issued as to Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (gb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Dewey Russell Thomas. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Nathan Morgan. (Filing fee paid $400) Service copies will be returned by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cigna Group Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant