This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 11:14:48 (UTC).

MORGAN v. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 MORGAN filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02718

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD MORGAN

Defendant

HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDA M. LOPEZ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE

2 Penn Center Suite 1240, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN P. DOWNEY

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

100 Market St Suite 200, Pobox 1181

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1181

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hartford Life, Inc.; Hartford Holdings, Inc.; Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021; HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e) or (f) SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/21/21. 6/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EDWARD MORGAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15197368.), filed by EDWARD MORGAN.(LOPEZ, LINDA) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hartford Life, Inc.; Hartford Holdings, Inc.; Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021; HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDOC # 2 MAILED TO UNREP (rf, ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e) or (f) SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/21/21. 6/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/21/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EDWARD MORGAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15197368.), filed by EDWARD MORGAN.(LOPEZ, LINDA) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDA MAALOUF LOPEZ