Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 09:54:11 (UTC).

Morgan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Morgan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert R Morgan

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Arthur Freese

Attorney at FREESE & GOSS, PLLC

1901 6Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

David P Matthews

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2905 Sackett St.

Houston, TX 77098

David Paul Matthews

Attorney at MATTHEWS & ASSOCIATES

2905 Sackett

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Dr., Ste. 400, Post Office Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236-4167

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/30/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/7/2021. (yf)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support re #17 Joint MOTION to Stay discovery and all pretrial deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/7/2021 (tab).

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Stay discovery and all pretrial deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/2021. (yf)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#8

(#8) MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders) (jtm)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04447. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#6

(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#5

(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 20978 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16270567 filed by Albert R Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/30/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER denying #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/7/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support re #17 Joint MOTION to Stay discovery and all pretrial deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/7/2021 (tab).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Stay discovery and all pretrial deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. No document attached. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/2021. (yf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders) (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04447. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 20978 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-4447-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16270567 filed by Albert R Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Arthur Freese

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Matthews