Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:50:38 (UTC).

Morgan v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Morgan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Judges

Kristi K. DuBose

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobby Ray Morgan

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at The Nations Law Firm

3131 Briarpark Dr., Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan I. Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jonathan Randall Little

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Brandon Keith Essig

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Notice of Filing Defendants First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of All Defendants (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Keith Essig on behalf of All Defendants (Essig, Brandon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/04/2019. (srd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

8 #3

Authorization

8 #2

HIPAA Protective Order

8 #1

Protective Order

#8

(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (srd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/1/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7771544) filed by Bobby Ray Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Bobby Ray Morgan(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Filing Defendants First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Nations. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:19-cv-00169. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2533678, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of All Defendants (Little, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Keith Essig on behalf of All Defendants (Essig, Brandon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/04/2019. (srd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (srd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/1/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No. 1 and Amended Order No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7771544) filed by Bobby Ray Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Bobby Ray Morgan(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Nations - PHV