This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:33:47 (UTC).

Morgan Stanley v. Babu

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Morgan Stanley filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Babu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00489

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

. Morgan Stanley

Morgan Stanley

Defendant

Nirav Babu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy C Bass

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MOTION for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to Nirav Babu by Morgan Stanley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bass, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2019 to add Motion for Entry of Default (tds, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley. Nirav Babu served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019.(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley.(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued 21 days as to Nirav Babu.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Hearing re #1 Complaint, #4 Notice (Other), Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause

4 #1

Attachment Declaration of Donald N. Cohen

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Donald N. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nirav Babu ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848278.), filed by Morgan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to Nirav Babu by Morgan Stanley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bass, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2019 to add Motion for Entry of Default (tds, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley. Nirav Babu served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019.(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley.(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued 21 days as to Nirav Babu.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Morgan Stanley was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Morgan Stanley was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Hearing re #1 Complaint, #4 Notice (Other), Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley re #1 Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Donald N. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Morgan Stanley Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley (Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nirav Babu ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848278.), filed by Morgan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less