This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 06:14:40 (UTC).

Alex Morgan et al v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc.

Case Summary

On March 8, 2019, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Carli Llyod, Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, and others (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Brian D. Netter of the US Department of Justice, Cardelle B. Spangler, Diana Hughes Leiden, and David G. Feher of Winston and Strawn LLP, and others, filed a labor lawsuit against the United States Soccer Federation, Inc., (“Defendant” or “USSF”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with damages for alleged discriminatory practices of the defendant. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California, with Judge Brad Seligman presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs stated, “The USSF is the common employer of the players on the WNT and the MNT. It centrally manages and controls every aspect of the senior national team program for both teams and their female and male members.”

The plaintiffs further stated, “The WNT has enjoyed unparalleled success in international soccer. The team has won three World Cup titles, most recently in 2015, four Olympic Gold Medals and numerous other international competitions. It is the three-time winner of the U.S. Olympic Committee’s Team of the Year Award and has been Sports Illustrated’s Athlete of the Year. The WNT is currently ranked number one in the world, a position it has held ten out of the last eleven years.”

The plaintiffs also stated, “The WNT’s success on the field has translated into substantial revenue generation and profits for the USSF. In fact, during the period relevant to this case, the WNT earned more in profit and/or revenue than the MNT.”

The plaintiffs alleged, “This centralized management and control has permitted the USSF to perpetuate gender-based discrimination against Plaintiffs and the class they seek to represent in nearly every aspect of their employment.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “The USSF has continually rejected WNT players’ requests for pay equal to the pay afforded to MNT players. In response to their demand in 2012, the USSF offered WNT players compensation only if they won games against FIFA-ranked top ten teams. The USSF would not have paid them for losing games, tying games or winning against teams ranked outside of the top ten.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “The USSF’s ongoing policies and practices of intentional gender discrimination extend beyond pay and into nearly every aspect of Plaintiffs and similarly situated WNT players’ work conditions. This includes playing, training and travel conditions; promotion of their games; support and development for their games and other terms and conditions of their employment that are less favorable than provided to MNT players.”

The plaintiff listed only one claim for relief for alleged violation of equal pay under The Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, as amended by the Equal Pay Act, 29 U.S.C. §§ 206 et seq.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment seeking declaratory and injunctive relief and an award for exemplary, punitive, and liquidated damages along with pre- and post-judgment interest, costs, and attorneys’ fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01717

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Megan Rapinoe

Becky Sauerbrunn

Rose Lavelle

Crystal Dunn

Danielle Colaprico

Casey Short

Merritt Mathias

Kelley OHara

Jessica McDonald

McCall Zerboni

Mallory Pugh

Tierna Davidson

Carli Lloyd

Tobin Heath

Morgan Brian

Christen Press

Lindsey Horan

Ashlyn Harris

Abby Dahlkemper

Jane Campbell

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Brian D Netter

Attorney at US Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Cardelle B Spangler

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

David G Feher

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0005

Jeanifer E Parsigian

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeffrey L Kessler

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Lev Tsukerman

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicole A Saharsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Jamie L Wine

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4834

Brian M Stolzenbach

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Chantelle C Egan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Cheryl A Luce

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Ellen E McLaughlin

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Giovanna A. Ferrari

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Kara L Goodwin

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Kristen M Peters

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3021

Kuan Huang

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-4834

Kyllan B Kershaw

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309-3958

Michele D Johnson

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

650 Town Center Drive 20Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1925

Noah A Finkel

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#320

(#320) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [DE #317 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

317 #4

Proposed Order

317 #3

Exhibit B

317 #2

Exhibit A

317 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler

317 #317

Main Document

#318

(#318) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. The parties' joint motion for a limited remand under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(b)(1) is granted. This proceeding is remanded to the district court for the sole purpose of considering the parties' settlement. [See document for more details.] (mat) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#316

(#316) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING #315 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby issues an indicative ruling under FRCP 62.1(a)(3) stating that it would grant the parties' motion for preliminary approval if the Ninth Circuit remands for that purpose or that the preliminary approval motion raises a substantial issue. (jp) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

315 #1

Exhibit A

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

383 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#320) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [DE #317 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiffs' Motion for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #317 , calendared for hearing on 7/25/2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Richard M. Nichols, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#318) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. The parties' joint motion for a limited remand under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(b)(1) is granted. This proceeding is remanded to the district court for the sole purpose of considering the parties' settlement. [See document for more details.] (mat) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING #315 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby issues an indicative ruling under FRCP 62.1(a)(3) stating that it would grant the parties' motion for preliminary approval if the Ninth Circuit remands for that purpose or that the preliminary approval motion raises a substantial issue. (jp) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. The parties joint motion to remove this appeal from the oral argument calendar and to place this appeal in abeyance is granted. Oral argument in this matter, scheduled for March 7, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., in Pasadena, California, is vacated. Further proceedings are stayed pending finalization of the terms of the parties settlement in principle. [see document for all details.](mat) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#313) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. Appellants unopposed motion to file under seal Volume 7 of the excerpts of record is granted. The Clerk will file publicly the opening brief, Volumes 1 through 6 of the excerpts of record, and the motion to seal. The Clerk will file under seal Volume 7 of the excerpts of record. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. (jp) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#312) NOTICE : Certificate Regarding Transcript filed by plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#311) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian D Netter counsel for Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Brian D. Netter is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Carli Lloyd, Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Netter, Brian) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
300 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE (Second) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Transfer of Action with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Feher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23340235) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23340129) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE (First ) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, identifying Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Carli Lloyd, Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, and United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Exhibit (non-trial),, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Exhibit A to Complaint) as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 . (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23339973 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Julie Ertz, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, Emily Sonnett, Megan Rapinoe, Allie Long, Kelley OHara, Alex Morgan, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Rose Lavelle, Ashlyn Harris, Andi Sullivan, Casey Short, Jane Campbell, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Tierna Davidson, Adrianna Franch, Samantha Mewis, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Abby Dahlkemper, Carli Lloyd, Mallory Pugh, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Morgan Brian. (Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Tobin Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Carli Lloyd(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Samantha Mewis(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Alex Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Megan Rapinoe(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Becky Sauerbrunn(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen M Peters

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chantelle Cappa Egan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl A. Luce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M Stolzenbach