This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 12:04:28 (UTC).

Moreno v. Perkins Will, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Moreno filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Perkins Will, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07443

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rigoberto Jose Moreno

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendants

Port of San Francisco

San Francisco Mayors Office of Children, Youth & Families

San Francisco Fire Department

San Francisco Adult Probation Department

Jordan Knighton Architects

San Francisco District Attorneys Office

San Francisco Public Utilities Commission

San Francisco Administration

San Francisco Sheriffs Dept.

San Francisco Police Department

San Francisco Public Health Dept.

San Francisco Recreation and Park Department

Perkins Will, Inc.

San Francisco Controller's Office

Mayors Office of Economic & Workforce Development

 

Court Documents

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

RESTRICTED

27 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #16 "Motion in Limine to Claim Preclusion for Discussing Lower Court Trial Rulings." (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#26

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

22 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#22

(#22) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#16

RESTRICTED

#8

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings RE #8 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#7

(#20) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable as addressed ; unable to forward re #7 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTION). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #22 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Mail Sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno Returned as Undeliverable re #23 Clerk's Notice requesting addresses for service of process. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #16 "Motion in Limine to Claim Preclusion for Discussing Lower Court Trial Rulings." (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re return copy of #16 MOTION in Limine. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #14 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #11 Clerk's Notice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CLERK'S NOTICE requesting addresses for service of process (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Mail sent to Jose Rigoberto Moreno returned as undeliverable re (44 in 3:19-cv-04206-EMC) Order Relating Case, (8 in 3:19-cv-07443-EMC) Order Relating Case. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable as addressed ; unable to forward re #7 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Related Case filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings RE #8 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 19-cv-7443-VKD. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv-04206-EMC. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/18/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received Documents: Proposed USM-285 Forms by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTION). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pretrial Statement and Proposed Order by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. No process. IFP Pending. Filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Francisco District Attorney's Office is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant