This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 08:58:51 (UTC).

Moreno v. Home Depot USA Inc

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Moreno filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01894

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Moreno

Defendants

Home Depot USA Inc formerly known as Home Depot Inc doing business as Home Depot #589

Home Depot Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Layla Ann Benjamin

Attorney at MLF Legal PLLC

702 S Beckley Avenue

Dallas, TX 75203

Daniel L Morris

Attorney at The Morris Law Firm PLLC

702 S Beckley Avenue

Dallas, TX 75203

A Robert Lamb, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of A Robert Lamb Jr

6860 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 200

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant Attorneys

Flannery Hoard Nardone

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Chad L Farrar

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

C Brett Stecklein

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Phillips Harrison

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Kimberly Moreno (Lamb, A) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 11/1/2021 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 11/9/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/29/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/10/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Moreno. (Lamb, A) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Home Depot Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #10

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #9

Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) B

1 #7

Exhibit(s) A-6

1 #6

Exhibit(s) A-5

1 #5

Exhibit(s) A-4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A-2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A-1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11004813) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) B, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Kimberly Moreno (Lamb, A) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 11/1/2021 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 11/9/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/29/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/10/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Moreno. (Lamb, A) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The plaintiff has yet to provide the clerk with a certificate of interested persons. N.D. TEX. CIV. R. 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) requires that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with... a separately signed certificate of interested persons that contains a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities who or which are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/20/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Jul 20 09:11:50 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Home Depot Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11004813) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) B, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Farrar, Chad) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant