This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2020 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

Moreno v. Brettkelly et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Moreno filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Brettkelly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02082

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Rigoberto Moreno

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendants

Anthony Brettkelly

Port of San Francisco

Mats Nalsen

Michael Dulworth

San Francisco Mayor's Office of Children, Youth & Familiesw

San Francisco Administration

Mayor's Office of Economic & Workforce Development

Lawrence D. Chan

San Francisco Fire Department

San Francisco Adult Probation Department

Paul Smith

Steven Gallardo-Brown

Nathan Kounter

Jesus Moreno

Maria Nesheva

San Francisco District Attorney's Office

Britt Miller

San Francisco Public Utilities Commission

San Francisco Public Health Dept.

15 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

16 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#16

(#16) ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION TO EXPUNGE FALSE ARREST CONVICTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#23) Received CD by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Supported Evidence as Exhibit A re: #20 Amended Complaint by Jose Rigoberto Moreno (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE re #20 Amended Complaint by Jose Rigoberto Moreno (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jordan Knigton Architects, Mayor's Office of Economic & Workforce Development, Perkins Will, Inc., Port of San Francisco, San Francisco Administration, San Francisco Adult Probation Department, San Francisco Controller's Office, San Francisco District Attorney's Office, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Mayor's Office of Children, Youth & Familiesw, San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Public Health Dept., San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, San Francisco Recreation and Park Department, San Francisco Sheriffs Dept.. Filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re initial documents (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) EXHIBITS re #17 Amended Complaint filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (Related document(s) #17 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jordan Knigton Architects, Mayor's Office of Economic & Workforce Development, Perkins Will, Inc., Port of San Francisco, San Francisco Administration, San Francisco Adult Probation Department, San Francisco Controller's Office, San Francisco District Attorney's Office, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Mayor's Office of Children, Youth & Familiesw, San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Public Health Dept., San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, San Francisco Sheriffs Dept., San Francisco Recreation and Park Department. Filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION TO EXPUNGE FALSE ARREST CONVICTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #2 IFP AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. #3 , #4 Motions for Permission for to File Electronically and #7 MOTION to Appear by Telephone DENIED. Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/08/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***PLEASE DISREGARD; INCORRECT IMAGE ATTACHED***ORDER GRANTING #2 IFP AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. #3 , #4 Motions for Permission for to File Electronically and #7 MOTION to Appear by Telephone DENIED. Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (jmdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE re Witness and Exhibit Record by Jose Rigoberto Moreno (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE re Northern District of California Checklist by Jose Rigoberto Moreno (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Case filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Authorize an Agreement for Fees and Expenses for Serving a Summons filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to File Electronically filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Anthony Brettkelly, Nicole Brown, Lawrence D. Chan, Michael Dulworth, Susan Eslick, Steven Gallardo-Brown, Hart Matejczyk, Urban Nest, Jordan Knigton Architects, Nathan Kounter, Mayor's Office of Economic & Workforce Development, Richard G. J. McDerby, Britt Miller, Jesus Moreno, Mats Nalsen, Maria Nesheva, Dee Nigam, Perkins Will, Inc., Port of San Francisco, Anne Quesada, San Francisco Administration, San Francisco Adult Probation Department, San Francisco Controller's Office, San Francisco District Attorney's Office, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Mayor's Office of Children, Youth & Familiesw, San Francisco Mayor's Office of Housing and Community Development, San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Public Health Dept., San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, San Francisco Sheriffs Dept., Michael Smith, Paul Smith, Shayana Williamson (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Jose Rigoberto Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Francisco District Attorney's Office is a litigant