This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2019 at 07:26:51 (UTC).

Moreno v. Bluestone Asset Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Moreno filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bluestone Asset Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo H Hinojosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo H Hinojosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raquel Ruth Moreno

Defendants

Raybec Crossing North, LLC

Bluestone Asset Management, LLC

Raybec Crossing Court, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ricardo Amador Rodriguez

Defendant Attorneys

John A Guerra

Amanda Esparza Carollo

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #2

Exhibit 2

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 8/9/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 7/24/2019 at 02:30 P.M. before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (previously set for 7/17/2019), filed. (adelagarza, 7) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed.(Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Striking Document re: #11 Initial Disclosures (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed.(Guerra, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed.(Guerra, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Raquel Ruth Moreno, filed.(Rodriguez, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition by Raquel Ruth Moreno, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rodriguez, Ricardo) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Striking Document re: #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed MOTION to Remand by Raquel Ruth Moreno, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2019. (Rodriguez, Ricardo) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Raquel Ruth Moreno.(Rodriguez, Ricardo) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed.(Guerra, John) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC, filed.(Guerra, John) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hidalgo County District Court, case number C-1682-19-H (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22462212) filed by Bluestone Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Guerra, John) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less