Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

Moreno v. Aukee et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Moreno filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Aukee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04206

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Defendants

Port of San Francisco

Sgt. Chu

Johnathan Brosnan

Lawrence D. Chan

Steve Gallardo Brown

Michael Dulworth

Tina Nunesober

San Francisco Administration

Kelsey Townsend

Chris Vicenzio

San Francisco Adult Probation

Jeanny Radia

Mats Nalsen

Vicky Hennessy

San Francisco Mayors Office of Children, Youth & Families

San Francisco Fire Department

San Francisco Public Utilities Commission

Nicole Brown

Perkins & Will Inc.

Mayors Office of Economic & Workforce Development

36 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Approval of Travel Reimbersement filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#17

(#17) Second MOTION for Leave to Amend Expedite Conference Status Hearing, Regarding Substantive Due Process in Absence of Undue Delay filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

16 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#16

(#16) ORDER denying #12 MOTION to Expedite filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

15 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Release Funds. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#14

(#14) REQUEST for Petition for a writ of certiorari by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

13 #1

Envelope

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Exhibits

#12

(#12) MOTION to Expedite Conference Status Hearing filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #2 Envelope) (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

11 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#11

(#11) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Plaintiff is to refile motion if necessary closer to hearing date. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Release Funds for Order Authorizing Disbribution of Funds Held in Court by the Department of Justice filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Approval of Travel Reimbersement filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Second MOTION for Leave to Amend Expedite Conference Status Hearing, Regarding Substantive Due Process in Absence of Undue Delay filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #12 MOTION to Expedite filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Release Funds. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REQUEST for Petition for a writ of certiorari by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Expedite Conference Status Hearing filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #2 Envelope) (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Plaintiff is to refile motion if necessary closer to hearing date. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #8 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Release Funds for Order Authorizing Disbribution of Funds Held in Court by the Department of Justice filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. Responses due by 8/29/2019. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail sent to Rigoberto Jose Moreno returned as undeliverable re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Copies of intiating documents)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Complaint With Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint/Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages against Eric Aukee, Antony Brettkelly, Johnathan Brosnan, Nicole Brown, Steve Gallardo Brown, Patricia Castillo, Lawrence D. Chan, Chu, Carmen Chu, Linda Colfax, Robert Duffield, Michael Dulworth, Susan Eslick, Vicky Hennessy, Karin Hilton, Jordan Knigton Architects, Nathan Kounter, Ricardo Lara, Claudia L. Lopez, Hart Matejcyzk, Mayors Office of Economic & Workforce Development, Britt Miller, Jesus Moreno, F. Murphy, Mats Nalsen, Maria Nesheva, Tina Nunesober, Perkins & Will Inc., Hortensia Ponce, Port of San Francisco, Anne Quesada, Ronald Quidachay, Jeanny Radia, Trent Rhorer, Mark Robbins, SF Medic 55, San Francisco Administration, San Francisco Adult Probation, San Francisco Controller, San Francisco District Attorney's Office, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Mayors Office of Children, Youth & Families, San Francisco Police Department, San Francisco Public Health Department, San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, San Francisco Recreation and Park Department, San Francisco Sheriff Department, Cheryl O. Sebastian, Michael Smith, Paul E. Smith, Kelsey Townsend, Chris Vicenzio, Kenya Whiterspoon, Shayna Williamson, Xiao Xiao (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Rigoberto Jose Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mayor Office is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO FIRE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PERKINS + WILL A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant