This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:10 (UTC).

MORENO et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by MORENO against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17149

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINCENT MORENO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR TO THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO (DECEASED)

VINCENT MORENO

THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VINCENT MORENO, THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Filing Receipt Dated August 23 2019

1 #2

Exhibit Letters of Administration

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by VINCENT MORENO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR TO THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO (DECEASED). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit Filing Receipt Dated August 23 2019)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VINCENT MORENO, THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 9/3/2019, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jdb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by VINCENT MORENO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR TO THE ESTATE OF DENISE MORENO (DECEASED). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit Filing Receipt Dated August 23 2019)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.