Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2020 at 09:17:05 (UTC).

Moreland v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Moreland filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04336

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Socorro Moreland

Defendants

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Pruco Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Georg Michael Capielo

Attorney at Winter and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Jack Bruce Winters, Jr

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Craig McKenzie Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-5005

Sarah D Ball

Attorney at Winter and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Michael Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Laura Leigh Geist

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Stay ) filed bySocorro Moreland. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Alex Tomasevic)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

18 #16

Exhibit O

18 #15

Exhibit N

18 #14

Exhibit M

18 #13

Exhibit L

18 #12

Exhibit K

18 #11

Exhibit J

18 #10

Exhibit I

18 #9

Exhibit H

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah D Ball for Plaintiff Moreland (Ball, Sarah) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Georg Michael Capielo for Plaintiff Moreland (Capielo, Georg) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Bruce Winters, Jr for Plaintiff Moreland (Winters, Jack) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14634963.). Filed bySocorro Moreland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Stay ) filed bySocorro Moreland. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Alex Tomasevic)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Michael Tomasevic for Plaintiff Socorro Moreland (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Stay filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/25/2020. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Proposed Order)(Geist, Laura) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint byPruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Geist, Laura) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/15/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Socorro Moreland.. (Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America re #11 Stipulation To Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (Geist, Laura) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Geist, Laura) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Socorro Moreland. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Socorro Moreland. Pruco Life Insurance Company served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/14/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah D Ball for Plaintiff Moreland (Ball, Sarah) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Georg Michael Capielo for Plaintiff Moreland (Capielo, Georg) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Bruce Winters, Jr for Plaintiff Moreland (Winters, Jack) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Pruco Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14634963.). Filed bySocorro Moreland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nicholas, Craig) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRUCO LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georg Michael Capielo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Winters, Jr.